Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gherardo Zandemaria

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1679³BornParma
26 Feb 171939.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 171939.6AppointedBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
21 May 171939.6Ordained BishopBishop of Borgo San Donnino, Italy
17 Dec 173152.1AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
5 Nov 174667.0DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gherardo Zandemaria:
Bishop Gherardo Zandemaria (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

  • a priest for 27.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 131
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015