Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Prignano

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1621³BornNovi
11 Mar 168058.8AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
17 Mar 168058.8Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
2 Aug 169776.2DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Prignano:
Bishop Girolamo Prignano (born , died ) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015