Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Tafuri, O.SS.T †

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616BornNapoli
25 Sep 167357.7AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
1 Oct 167357.8Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
Dec 167963.9DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Tafuri:
Bishop Domenico Tafuri O.SS.T Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 139
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013