Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Costantino Testa, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹Born
24 Jan 162844.0AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
6 Feb 162844.0Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
Feb 1637³53.0DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Costantino Testa
Bishop Costantino Testa O.P. (born 1584, died Feb 1637) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModena, Diocese of Modena
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceSant’Angelo Le Fratte, Diocese of Satriano e Campagna
Buried Place (Original)Sant’Angelo, Church, Sant’Angelo Le Fratte, Diocese of Satriano e Campagna

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 131
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1628, Number 5
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,981
  • loc: AT, 18 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 21 Mar 2019

Quantcast