Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco de Leone

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1728BornBarletta
18 Dec 175123.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 177344.5AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
20 Jun 177344.5Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
179364.1DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco de Leone:
Bishop Marco de Leone (born ) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013