Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bondola, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1648³BornNapoli
1 Apr 166416.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
5 Apr 167022.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
14 Mar 167122.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
2 Dec 169749.6AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
8 Dec 169749.7Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
4 Feb 171364.8DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Bondola:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bondola O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 140
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1697, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015