Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Anzani

Deceased

Bishop of Satriano e Campagna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1701BornAriano
20 Sep 172725.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 172726.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Nov 173635.0AppointedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
25 Nov 173635.0Ordained BishopBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy
12 Feb 177068.3DiedBishop of Satriano e Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Anzani:
Bishop Giovanni Anzani (born , died ) Bishop of Satriano e Campagna

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1764
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1736, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015