Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso de Sarria, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Taranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹BornPontevedra, Spain
13 Mar 165448.2SelectedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
16 Oct 165650.8ConfirmedArchbishop of Trani, Italy
13 Apr 166559.3AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
5 Nov 168276.8DiedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso de Sarria:
Archbishop Tommaso de Sarria O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Taranto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 341, and Page 327
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 187, Number 1,173

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 17 Mar 2014