Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Primi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1627BornRagusa
24 Sep 165022.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Jul 166941.7AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
21 Jul 166941.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
1702²74.2DiedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Primi:
Bishop Antonio Primi O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015