Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Martinelli, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Patti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornPalermo
167760.0Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
22 Jan 168063.0AppointedBishop of Patti, Italy
28 Jan 168063.0Ordained BishopBishop of Patti, Italy
3 Apr 168164.2DiedBishop of Patti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Martinelli:
Bishop Francesco Martinelli C.O. (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Patti

  • a priest for 4.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 302
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 Mar 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015