Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marco Cardinal Galli (Gallo, Gallio)

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619¹Born
13 Jan 165940.0AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
26 Jan 165940.0Ordained BishopBishop of Rimini, Italy
Jul 1666³47.5AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Feb 1667³48.0ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Sep 168162.6Elevated to Cardinal
17 Nov 168162.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
24 Jul 168364.5DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Galli (Gallo, Gallio) (VIAF: 30344133)
Marco Cardinal Galli (Gallo, Gallio) (born 1619, died ) Bishop of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceComo

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 95
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Aug 2014
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 4
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017