Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptista van Neercassel

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1625¹BornGorcum
1648¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 166237.4AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
23 Jun 166237.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
17 Sep 166237.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
18 May 166338.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
6 Jun 168661.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptista van Neercassel:
Bishop Johannes Baptista van Neercassel (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 2 Apr 2015