Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Boudewijn Cats (Catzius)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹Born
31 May 166261.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands
31 May 166261.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippi
17 Sep 166261.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippi
18 May 166362.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission), Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Boudewijn Cats (Catzius)
Bishop Boudewijn Cats (Catzius) (born 1601, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Batavia (Holland Mission)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorcum

  • a bishop for .6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1662, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018