Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Torriano

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Dec 1666AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
21 Dec 1666Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
9 Oct 1679DiedBishop of Como, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Torriano
Bishop Ambrogio Torriano (died ) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIndovero

  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158
  • ob/c2+: CB, 15 Nov 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1666, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018