Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Rinuccini (Ruccini)

Deceased

Bishop of Pistoia e Prato


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Aug 1656AppointedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
10 Sep 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy
11 Mar 1678DiedBishop of Pistoia e Prato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Rinuccini (Ruccini)
Bishop Francesco Rinuccini (Ruccini) (died ) Bishop of Pistoia e Prato

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 119, Number 725
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016