Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Camillo Cardinal Astalli-Pamphilj

Deceased

Bishop of Catania

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1619²BornRome
19 Sep 165031.7Elevated to Cardinal
17 Oct 165031.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
4 Jul 166142.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Catania, Italy
25 Jul 166142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Catania, Italy
21 Dec 166344.9DiedBishop of Catania, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Astalli-Pamphilj:
Camillo Cardinal Astalli-Pamphilj (born 1619, died ) Bishop of Catania

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
  • a cardinal for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1650
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 142
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015