Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Friedrich Cardinal von Hessen-Darmstadt, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1616BornDarmstadt
1636²19.8Converted
19 Feb 165235.9Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 165539.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
30 Mar 166145.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
14 Nov 166751.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
12 Mar 166852.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
14 May 167054.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
3 Sep 167155.5SelectedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
19 Feb 167255.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 167256.0ConfirmedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
5 Feb 167356.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland
19 Feb 168265.9DiedBishop of Wrocław (Breslau), Poland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Hessen-Darmstadt:
Friedrich Cardinal von Hessen-Darmstadt O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Bishop of Wrocław (Breslau)

  • a priest for 10.0 years
  • a bishop for 9.0 years
  • a cardinal for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Feb 1652
  • b: Die Bisch÷fe des Heiligen R÷mischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1673, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015