Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gerolamo Passarelli

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1637BornCatanzaro
30 Jan 167335.1AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
12 Mar 167335.2Ordained BishopBishop of Isernia, Italy
14 Nov 168951.9AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
Nov 1690³52.8DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Passarelli:
Archbishop Gerolamo Passarelli (born , died Nov 1690) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230, and Page 340
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015