Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Masseri

Deceased

Bishop of Anagni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1613BornPerusin
23 Dec 164532.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 168168.1AppointedBishop of Anagni, Italy
24 Jun 168168.1Ordained BishopBishop of Anagni, Italy
Aug 169582.2DiedBishop of Anagni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Masseri:
Bishop Bernardino Masseri (born ) Bishop of Anagni

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013