Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carlo Cardinal Cerri

Deceased

Bishop of Ferrara

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1610BornRome
29 Nov 166959.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 May 167059.6AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
19 May 167059.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
17 Aug 167059.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
14 May 169079.6DiedBishop of Ferrara, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Cerri:
Carlo Cardinal Cerri (born , died ) Bishop of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 19.7 years
  • a cardinal for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1669

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015