Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Marazzani

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1624¹BornPlaisance
29 Aug 165935.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Aug 165935.6Ordained PriestPriest
1 Sep 165935.6AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
28 Sep 165935.7Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
25 Feb 168258.1DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Marazzani:
Bishop Claudio Marazzani (died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a priest for 22.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 739
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 312
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015