Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Azon Ariosti

Deceased

Archbishop of Avignon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1601¹BornBologne
9 Sep 166968.6AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
22 Sep 166968.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
18 Nov 167271.8DiedArchbishop of Avignon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Azon Ariosti:
Archbishop Azon Ariosti (died ) Archbishop of Avignon

  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 109
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1669, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 8 Apr 2015