Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio Avio

Deceased

Bishop of Narni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1625BornCamerino
1 Sep 167044.8AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
19 Oct 167044.9Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
9 Aug 168256.7DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Avio:
Bishop Ottavio Avio (born , died ) Bishop of Narni

  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 280
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 10 Apr 2015