Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Pianetti

Deceased

Bishop of Todi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1631Born
19 Mar 166534.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jul 167342.4AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
30 Jul 167342.5Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
Feb 1709³78.0DiedBishop of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Pianetti
Bishop Giuseppe Pianetti (born , died Feb 1709) Bishop of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIesi

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 35.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 394
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1673, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018