Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Asinari di Sanmarzano

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Ephesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1795BornTorino
19 Sep 181823.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 184650.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
1 Feb 184650.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
2 Jul 187680.9DiedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Asinari di Sanmarzano:
Archbishop Alessandro Asinari di Sanmarzano (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Ephesus

  • a priest for 57.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013