Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ludovico Ideo, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1811Born
1832¹20.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Mar 183422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Jun 185847.1AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
4 Jul 185847.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
4 Dec 188069.6DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Ideo (VIAF: 305358081)
Bishop Ludovico Ideo O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Lipari

EventPlace
Birth PlacePietraperzia
Ordained BishopSt. Athanase, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1858, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017