Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Marsili

Deceased

Archbishop of Siena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1740BornSiena
29 Sep 177232.0Ordained PriestPriest of Siena, Italy
3 Dec 179252.1AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
9 Dec 179252.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siena, Italy
27 Dec 179454.2DiedArchbishop of Siena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Marsili:
Archbishop Alfonso Marsili (born , died ) Archbishop of Siena

  • a priest for 22.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014