Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Martini

Deceased

Bishop of Bova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1728Born
25 Mar 176940.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179263.4SelectedBishop of Bova, Italy
26 Mar 179263.5ConfirmedBishop of Bova, Italy
9 Apr 179263.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
15 Feb 180273.4DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Martini
Bishop Giuseppe Martini (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuscaldo

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 129
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018