Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Bugliari

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Thagaste


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1742Born
12 Oct 176623.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Nov 176624.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 179249.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thagaste
10 Apr 179249.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thagaste
17 Aug 180663.8DiedTitular Bishop of Thagaste

MicroData Summary for Francesco Bugliari
Bishop Francesco Bugliari (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Thagaste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Sophia

  • a priest for 39.7 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 399, and Page 455
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,792, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast