Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joannes Chrysostomus de Clugny, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1723Born
26 Apr 177047.3AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
13 May 177047.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania
30 Jul 179572.6DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo) (Albanian), Albania

MicroData Summary for Joannes Chrysostomus de Clugny:
Archbishop Joannes Chrysostomus de Clugny O.F.M. Conv. (died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 203

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013