Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico Capece Minutolo, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mileto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1745³BornNapoli
28 May 176823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
13 Jun 179247.3SelectedBishop of Mileto, Italy
18 Jun 179247.4ConfirmedBishop of Mileto, Italy
24 Jun 179247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mileto, Italy
6 May 182479.2DiedBishop of Mileto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Capece Minutolo
Bishop Enrico Capece Minutolo C.O. (born , died ) Bishop of Mileto

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016