Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Spagnoletti, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1725BornStagnen
6 Mar 175125.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Mar 179266.3AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
9 Apr 179266.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
24 Jun 179973.5DiedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Luigi Spagnoletti:
Archbishop Luigi Spagnoletti O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa)

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014