Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Grillo, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1744BornSant’Agata
1 May 176823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Feb 179247.2SelectedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
26 Mar 179247.3ConfirmedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
9 Apr 179247.4Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
29 Oct 180459.9AppointedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
2 Nov 180459.9DiedBishop of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Grillo
Bishop Francesco Antonio Grillo O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Cassano all’Jonio

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 279
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 138
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016