Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Brancaccio

Deceased

Bishop of Ostuni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1730Born
21 Sep 175424.2Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179161.4SelectedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
27 Feb 179261.6ConfirmedBishop of Ostuni, Italy
4 Mar 179261.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ostuni, Italy
15 Oct 179464.2DiedBishop of Ostuni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Brancaccio
Bishop Giovanni Battista Brancaccio (born , died ) Bishop of Ostuni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorre del Greco

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 321
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018