Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Graziosi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Palestrina

Titular Bishop of Anastasiopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1735³BornBorbona
19 Sep 176125.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 179256.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
24 Sep 179256.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
30 Sep 179256.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anastasiopolis
1811¹75.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Graziosi
Bishop Giuseppe Graziosi (born , died 1811) Auxiliary Bishop of Palestrina

  • a priest for 49.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 82, and Page 451
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 73
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 7 Nov 2016