Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Castiglione

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1742BornIschia
23 Feb 180159.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Jan 180361.0Elevated to Cardinal
17 Jan 180361.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
11 Jan 180865.9AppointedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
31 Jan 180866.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
9 Jan 181572.9DiedBishop of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Castiglione:
Cardinal Giovanni Castiglione (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo e Cingoli

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
  • a cardinal for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013