Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nikolaj Ferrich

Deceased

Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1736BornRagusa
14 Apr 175922.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 179255.8AppointedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
9 Apr 179255.9Ordained BishopBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina
30 May 181983.0DiedBishop of Trebinje e Mrkan, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Nikolaj Ferrich
Bishop Nikolaj Ferrich (born , died ) Bishop of Trebinje e Mrkan

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 275
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016