Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Selvi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1752BornSorano Sovana
14 Apr 177624.2Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 179341.4AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
23 Jun 179341.4Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
9 Jun 183583.3ResignedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
11 Dec 184391.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Selvi
Bishop Fabrizio Selvi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 50.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1835
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 229
  • r/d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 207
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1793, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016