Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Saverio Saggese

Deceased

Bishop of Montepeloso, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1740Born
21 Sep 176423.8Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179151.0SelectedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
27 Feb 179251.2ConfirmedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
4 Mar 179251.2Ordained BishopBishop of Montepeloso, Italy
6 Dec 179454.0DiedBishop of Montepeloso, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Francesco Saverio Saggese
Bishop Francesco Saverio Saggese (born , died ) Bishop of Montepeloso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoseto

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 296
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018