Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore Maria Lombardi

Deceased

Bishop of Andria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1739³BornMagdalena
5 Jun 176223.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179152.6SelectedBishop of Andria, Italy
27 Feb 179252.8ConfirmedBishop of Andria, Italy
4 Mar 179252.8Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
27 Jan 182181.7DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Maria Lombardi:
Bishop Salvatore Maria Lombardi (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1806
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 83
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 7 Oct 2013