Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea de Lucia

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi e Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1742BornMugnano
3 Nov 176522.9Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 179149.0SelectedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
27 Feb 179249.2ConfirmedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
4 Mar 179249.2Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
25 Jun 181875.5AppointedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy
15 Mar 183087.2DiedBishop of Calvi e Teano, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Andrea de Lucia
Bishop Andrea de Lucia (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi e Teano

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 141
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 21 Feb 2016