Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Fortunato

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1733Born
14 Apr 175925.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 179258.4SelectedBishop of Lavello, Italy
26 Mar 179258.5ConfirmedBishop of Lavello, Italy
9 Apr 179258.5Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
26 Dec 179966.2DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Fortunato
Bishop Gennaro Fortunato (born , died ) Bishop of Lavello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRionero

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 256
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1792, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast