Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Leonardo Maria Di Fusco, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Acerra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1719BornMontedoro
5 Nov 174122.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Feb 179272.5AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
4 Mar 179272.5Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
1795¹75.4DiedBishop of Acerra, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gian Leonardo Maria Di Fusco:
Bishop Gian Leonardo Maria Di Fusco O.P. (born ) Bishop of Acerra

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1795
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 63
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015