Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Fazzi

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1768BornCalci
17 Dec 179123.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 180637.9AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
12 Oct 180637.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
25 Aug 183263.8DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Fazzi:
Bishop Pietro Fazzi (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 266

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013