Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Ranghiasci

Deceased

Bishop of San Severino (Marche)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1754BornGubbio
2 Dec 178127.4Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 181662.0AppointedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
4 Aug 181662.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy
13 May 183883.8DiedBishop of San Severino (Marche), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Ranghiasci:
Bishop Giacomo Ranghiasci (born , died ) Bishop of San Severino (Marche)

  • a priest for 56.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013