Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Ganucci

Deceased

Bishop of Livorno, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1741Born
17 Jun 175918.3ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
19 Sep 177231.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
20 Sep 180261.6AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
26 Sep 180261.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cortona, Italy
6 Oct 180665.6AppointedBishop of Livorno, Italy
12 Feb 181372.0DiedBishop of Livorno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Ganucci
Bishop Filippo Ganucci (born , died ) Bishop of Livorno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,802, Number 59
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 164, and Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast