Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Rosati

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Todi, Italy

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1799Born
23 Mar 185556.0AppointedBishop of Todi, Italy
25 Mar 185556.0Ordained BishopBishop of Todi, Italy
9 Mar 1882³83.0ResignedBishop of Todi, Italy
30 Mar 188283.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
14 Mar 188485.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Todi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Rosati
Bishop Giovanni Rosati (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Todi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerentino
Ordained BishopXII Apostoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1882
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399, and Page 571
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016