Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario De Luca

Deceased

Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1811Born
13 Jun 183524.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Mar 185241.1SelectedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
27 Sep 185241.6ConfirmedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
29 Sep 185241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy
24 Mar 185544.1DiedBishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso), Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario De Luca
Bishop Mario De Luca (born , died ) Bishop of Gravina e Irsina (Montepeloso)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSerracapriola
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 19.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 291
  • c2+: CB, 25 Mar 2012
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1852, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast