Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Manzo

Deceased

Archbishop of Chieti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1785³BornNapoli
27 May 180923.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Dec 184459.3SelectedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
21 Apr 184559.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
1 May 184559.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
18 Aug 185267.0SelectedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
27 Sep 185267.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy
7 Mar 185670.6DiedArchbishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Manzo (VIAF: 89245798)
Archbishop Michele Manzo (born , died ) Archbishop of Chieti

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 545
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1845, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016