Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico Ventura

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1806BornBisceglia
4 Apr 182923.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Sep 184640.4SelectedBishop of Termoli, Italy
21 Dec 184640.7ConfirmedBishop of Termoli, Italy
27 Dec 184640.7Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
15 Nov 184842.6SelectedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
20 Apr 184943.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
11 Feb 186255.8DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Ventura:
Archbishop Domenico Ventura (born , died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1861
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 92, and Page 549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013